Dorayn Madnick v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dorayn Madnick
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv05069
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2019.) (mrgo)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Percy Anderson, ORDERING Affidavit of Service submitted by Plaintiff Dorayn Madnick received on 08/02/2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) service cannot be made by a party, (2) must serve both the summons and complaint, and (3) service must be made pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 4(i). (mrgo)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court is in receipt of "Addition of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Complaint" (Docket No. 6 "Replacement Exhibits") filed by plaintiff Dorayn Madnick ("Plaintiff"). Plaintiff filed the Replacement Exhibits to replace two exhibits in Plaintiffs Complaint that Plaintiff identified as blurry. The Replacement Exhibits include Plaintiff's social security number. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) provides that a public filing may contain only the last four digits of a social security number. The Court orders the Clerk to place the Replacement Exhibits under seal. The Court also orders the Clerk to place pages 38 and 39 of the Complaint (Docket No. 1) under seal because they also display Plaintiff's social-security number. In the future, Plaintiff "shall carefully examine the documents, exhibits, or attachments to be filed with the Court in order to protect any sensitive and private information. The responsibility for redacting or placing under seal protected personal data identifiers rests solely with" Plaintiff. See Local Rule 5.2-1. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED ADDITION OF EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Filed as to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . (mrgo)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (lh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant United States of America.Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Filing Fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Dorayn Madnick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/6/2019) (mrgo). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #2 Pages 38 and 39 of complaint) (mrgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorayn Madnick v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorayn Madnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?