James Johnson v. Los Angeles Sheriffs Department et al
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Defendant: Deputy Inez, Los Angeles Sheriffs Department, Sgt Moore and Alex Villanueva
Case Number: 2:2019cv05070
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff James Johnson. (dts)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Inez(individual), Inez(official capacity), Los Angeles Sheriffs Department, Alex Villanueva ; Party Moore (official capacity) and Moore (individual) terminated, amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 , filed by Plaintiff James Johnson(hr)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Notice of Dismissal) (dts)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned addressed to James Johnson re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #5 . Return to sender. Attempted - not known. Note: Added BK # to address and sent document to inmate. (hr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned addressed to James Johnson re Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P), #4 . Return to sender. Attempted - not known. Note: Added Bk # to address and sent document to inmate. (hr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (dts)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: CONDITIONALLY granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $.80 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (dts)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff James Johnson. (lh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Inez(individual), Inez(official capacity), Los Angeles Sheriffs Department, Moore(individual), Moore(official capacity), Alex Villanueva pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Filed by Plaintiff James Johnson. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Johnson v. Los Angeles Sheriffs Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Inez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?