Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Orient Overseas Container Line Limited et al

Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Orient Overseas Container Line Limited, OOCL (USA) Inc. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv05092
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Kirsch, Joshua)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. Dkt. #14 (ake)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, upon Defendant OOCL (USA) Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Kaitlynn Mannix - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the summons issued as Attachment 1 on docket entry number 9 was docketed inadvertently. The correctsummons was issued as docket number 10. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants OOCL (USA) Inc., and Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (Attachments: #1 Netlancer Inc.) (jtil)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York, identifying Paramount Export Company. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying American Financial Group; Great American Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23904531 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Great American Insurance Company of New York(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Orient Overseas Container Line Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orient Overseas Container Line Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OOCL (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?