ProCare Hospice, LLC v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: ProCare Hospice, LLC
Defendant: Alex M. Azar and Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv05096
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alex M. Azar, II answer now due 9/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar, II.(Attorney Karen Yumi Paik added to party Alex M. Azar, II(pty:dft))(Paik, Karen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ProCare Hospice, LLC, upon Defendant Alex M. Azar, II served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Daucher, Brian)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01007 DMG(RAOx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05096 DMG(RAOx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. (car)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ProCare Hospice, LLC. (Daucher, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff ProCare Hospice, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01007 DMG (RAOx); 8:19-cv-01098 DMG (RAOx) (Daucher, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ProCare Hospice, LLC, identifying Traditions Health LLC. (Daucher, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ProCare Hospice, LLC. (Daucher, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23905652 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ProCare Hospice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Brian M Daucher added to party ProCare Hospice, LLC(pty:pla))(Daucher, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProCare Hospice, LLC v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProCare Hospice, LLC
Represented By: Brian M Daucher
Represented By: Ashton Taylor-Misha Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Karen Yumi Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?