Edward Dean Hohner v. U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration et al
Plaintiff: Edward Dean Hohner
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justie U.S. Immigration and Customs Service, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation and U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv05100
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-02669 GW(PLAx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05100 GW(PLAx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Defendants U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service.Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid), filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 filing fee from Edward Dean Hohner. Re: Notice Re: Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47P),,, #1 . Receipt number LA191582. (ek)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action will be dismissed and the file closed. If you submit the CV-60P form or pay the filing fee within THIRTY DAYS, your case will be filed. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: #1 CV-60P) (lh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #2 Lodged Complaint) (lh).
June 12, 2019 LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward Dean Hohner v. U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Dean Hohner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justie U.S. Immigration and Customs Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?