Raffi Boyadjian v. Carbon and Clay Company
Plaintiff: Raffi Boyadjian
Defendant: Carbon and Clay Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05129
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF ACTION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 7/22/2019, Plaintiff Raffi Boyadjian filed a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice of the action against Defendant Carbon and Clay Company #12 . The Court therefore DISMISSES this action, without prejudice. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #10 is DENIED without prejudice as moot and the Court VACATES the hearing on that motion scheduled for 8/9/2019. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Raffi Boyadjian. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Marron, Ronald)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Defendant Carbon and Clay Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: MMM Webpage on Target.com)(Benson, Kathrynn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Carbon and Clay Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kathrynn Frances Benson added to party Carbon and Clay Company(pty:dft)) (Benson, Kathrynn)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lilach Halperin counsel for Plaintiff Raffi Boyadjian. Adding Lilach Halperin as counsel of record for Raffi Boyadjian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Raffi Boyadjian. (Attorney Lilach Halperin added to party Raffi Boyadjian(pty:pla))(Halperin, Lilach)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Carbon and Clay Company. (lom)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Raffi Boyadjian. (Marron, Ronald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Certification as to Interested Parties, and No. 3 Summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (lh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23910262 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Raffi Boyadjian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Proposed Summons) (Attorney Ronald A Marron added to party Raffi Boyadjian(pty:pla))(Marron, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raffi Boyadjian v. Carbon and Clay Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffi Boyadjian
Represented By: Ronald A Marron
Represented By: Michael T Houchin
Represented By: Lilach Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon and Clay Company
Represented By: Omar Ahmed Siddiqui
Represented By: Kathrynn Frances Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?