Tal Hauser v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Tal Hauser
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv05166
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 9/23/2019. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 5/1/2020. Last Day to Hear Motions 6/1/2020. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 7/27/2020. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 8/17/2020 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 4-6 Days) set for 9/1/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/17/2020. (iv)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called and counsel make their appearance. The Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets dates. Please see separate Order Re Jury Trial, also filed today. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-6 days, filed by Plaintiff Tal Hauser.. (Barari, Neama)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE and Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court Of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice ot Parties and State Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court)(Semaan, Amanda)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, re Declaration #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on June 14, 2019. (Semaan, Amanda)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Order Setting Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Tal Hauser. (Barari, Neama)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Tal Hauser.. (Barari, Neama)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Tal Hauser All Plaintiffs, identifying Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Barari, Neama)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 8/5/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/12/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, National Association., Does 1-20, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Tal Hauser. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Semaan, Amanda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association identifying Wells Fargo & Company as Corporate Parent. (Semaan, Amanda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Carrie J. Twedt re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Semaan, Amanda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Semaan, Amanda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV12485 Receipt No: 0973-23916043 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Answer)) (Attorney Amanda Semaan added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:dft))(Semaan, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tal Hauser v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tal Hauser
Represented By: Marshall Adair Caskey
Represented By: Neama Cory Barari
Represented By: Daniel Michael Holzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Amanda Semaan
Represented By: Ellen E Boshkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?