Jose R. Perez v. General Information Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose R Perez and Jose R. Perez
Defendant: UNITED STATES POST OFFICE, HireRight, LLC., General Information Services, Inc. and Does 1-10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05184
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to HireRight, LLC. answer now due 8/12/2019; General Information Services, Inc. answer now due 8/13/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants HireRight, LLC.; General Information Services, Inc..(Attorney Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr added to party General Information Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr added to party HireRight, LLC.(pty:dft))(Lohr, Jessica)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant General Information Services, Inc. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Post Office. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant HireRight, LLC. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Fok, Devin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 Jose R Perez. (Fok, Devin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 Jose R Perez. (Fok, Devin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 Jose R Perez. (Fok, Devin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose R Perez. (Fok, Devin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23918892 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Devin H Fok added to party Jose R Perez(pty:pla))(Fok, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose R. Perez v. General Information Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POST OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HireRight, LLC.
Represented By: Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R Perez
Represented By: Devin H Fok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R. Perez
Represented By: Devin H Fok
Represented By: Joseph Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?