Chris Langer v. Martha A. Palacios et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, El Baron De C.A. Restaurant LLC and Martha A. Palacios
Case Number: 2:2019cv05196
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Martha A. Palacios (shb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to EL BARON DE C.A. RESTAURANT LLC (shb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Martha A. Palacios filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant El Baron De C.A. Restaurant LLC filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff /s to show cause in writing no later than July 26, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and sanctions imposed on counsel. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Defendant/s Answer/Response to the Complaint/Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Defaulton defendant/s OR appropriate request for dismissal of this action. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff/s is due. Plaintiff is to serve notice of this Order on all named parties in this action who have beenserved but have not yet appeared. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions including the dismissal of this action. (shb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Martha A. Palacios served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant El Baron De C.A. Restaurant LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: MARTHA PALACIOS in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation Early Mediation and Stay Program. See Notice for complete details.
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants El Baron De C.A. Restaurant LLC, Martha A. Palacios. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919199 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. Martha A. Palacios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Baron De C.A. Restaurant LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha A. Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?