Chris Langer v. Jon Ungvari et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Kedist Negash, Hannibal Zewdie Kassaye, Jon Ungvari and Susan D. Ungvari
Case Number: 2:2019cv05197
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Susan D. Ungvari served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 certification re interested parties re: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 (House, Lawrence)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Section I (Identifying information) of Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact information incorrect; re name and information of attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Answer to Complaint #16 , for the following reasons: (1) Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry; (2) Document attached is not an answer. (jp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Jon Ungvari served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven R Tekosky counsel for Unknown Cavalier Closeouts Inc.. Steven R. Tekosky will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Unknown Cavalier Closeouts, Inc. and Eyal Dahan. (Tekosky, Steven)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 7/23/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #19 ] ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 certification re interested parties filed by Defendant Jon Ungvari.(House, Lawrence). Modified on 7/23/2019 (jp).
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 Text Only Entry re Answer to Complaint #12 . Counsel for defendant Jon Ungvari shall file a notice of interested parties by 12:00 noon on July 23, 2019; counsel for plaintiff shall file the proof of service of summons and complaint as to defendant Jon Ungvari by 12:00 noon on July 23, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Hannibal Zewdie Kassaye served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Abby(Doe)-Person in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 21, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Kedist Negash served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Abby(Doe)-Person in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jon Ungvari.(Attorney Lawrence Philip House added to party Jon Ungvari(pty:dft))(House, Lawrence)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid filed by Unknown party Cavalier Closeouts Inc.. (Attorney Steven R Tekosky added to party Cavalier Closeouts Inc.(pty:unk)) (Tekosky, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth C. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Does (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/2/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24021173) #9 , for the following reasons: Document submitted in the wrong case. (jp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 7/3/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #10 ] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth C. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Does (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/2/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24021173) filed by Cavalier Closeouts, Inc. and Eyal Dahan Does. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Steven R Tekosky added to party Does(pty:dft)) (Tekosky, Steven). Modified on 7/3/2019 (jp).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Hannibal Zewdie Kassaye, Kedist Negash, Jon Ungvari, Susan D. Ungvari. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919204 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. Jon Ungvari et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Steven R Tekosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kedist Negash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannibal Zewdie Kassaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Ungvari
Represented By: Lawrence Philip House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan D. Ungvari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?