Chris Langer v. S and Pico LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Emma Giron, S & Pico LLC and S and Pico LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05199
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to S and Pico LLC a California Limited Liability Company (shb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant S and Pico LLC filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant S and Pico LLC served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: KATHY JONGSOON CHUNG in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Emma Giron served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emma Giron in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #11 served on 07-17-2019. (Carson, Chris)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM. See order for complete details. (jre)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 First NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant, Emma Giron Emma Giron, (Garber, Adolfo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Emma Giron Emma Giron.(Attorney Adolfo Bojalil Garber added to party Emma Giron(pty:dft))(Garber, Adolfo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation Early Mediation and Stay Program. See Notice for complete details. (jre)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Emma Giron, S and Pico LLC. (lh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919254 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. S and Pico LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Giron
Represented By: Adolfo Bojalil Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & Pico LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S and Pico LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?