Mike Bulaon et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Devon Lapier, John Andrade, Laura Huizar, Rafael Ceja, Willis Hayes, Orlando Ibarra, Holly Ellis, Erasmo Garcia, Raed Ari, David Bell, Nick Brannon, Dan Breckenridge, Frank Marshall, Mark Doty, Solomon Aleka, Martin Mahmoudi, Daniel Braun, Jim Gill, Linda Hayes, Patricia Belk, Marcos Cobian, Luis Lopez, Frank Belk, Chad Hughes, Francisco Delacruz, Kyle Krall, Scott Kidd, Calvin Ciapponi, Thaddeus Dykier, Mark Bunker, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc., Brent Lehr, Michael Jackson, Larry Capatosto, Alfonso Hernandez, Casey Dean, Dale Hale, Amos Gates, Tim Allen, Cole Einhaus, Ron Lake, David Fee, Jose Huiza, Elaine Marshall, Sean Kehoe, Robert Ellington, Linda Brubaker, Franklin Kempner, Jon Aleka, Andy Fok, Michael Hosford, Victor Davis, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, James Aukes, Edward Curley, Mauro Lopez, Jose Acevedo, Janine Lehr, Dudley Baker, Ruben Hurtado, Dan Klatt, Bill Brubaker, Stanley Bronstrup, Jerry Kenny, Dustin Coyner, Kip Holbrook, Michael Blankenship, Ryan Berry, Robert Garitano, Robert Brenier, Idovino Artifon, Mike Lapier, Gerando Barron, Meridith Holloway, Mayra Hernandez, Darrell Anderson, Matt Manna, Daniel Duffy, Alex Llamas, Kevin Harms, Jon Barnhart, Richard Dryer, Billy Duckworth and Mike Bulaon
Defendant: Courtesy Chevrolet Center, General Motors LLC, Paradise Chevrolet, Robert Bosch GmbH and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05205
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, Jon Aleka, Solomon Aleka, Tim Allen, Darrell Anderson, John Andrade, Raed Ari, Idovino Artifon, James Aukes, Dudley Baker, Jon Barnhart, Gerando Barron, Frank Belk, Patricia Belk, David Bell, Ryan Berry, Michael Blankenship, Nick Brannon, Daniel Braun, Dan Breckenridge, Robert Brenier, Stanley Bronstrup, Bill Brubaker, Linda Brubaker, Mike Bulaon, Mark Bunker, Larry Capatosto, Rafael Ceja, Calvin Ciapponi, Marcos Cobian, Dustin Coyner, Edward Curley, Victor Davis, Casey Dean, Francisco Delacruz, Mark Doty, Richard Dryer, Billy Duckworth, Daniel Duffy, Thaddeus Dykier, Cole Einhaus, Robert Ellington, Holly Ellis, David Fee, Andy Fok, Erasmo Garcia, Robert Garitano, Amos Gates, Jim Gill, David Graham, Mike Gurtovoy, Dale Hale, Kevin Harms, Linda Hayes, Willis Hayes, Alfonso Hernandez, Mayra Hernandez, Kip Holbrook, Meridith Holloway, Michael Hosford, Chad Hughes, Jose Huiza, Laura Huizar, Ruben Hurtado, Orlando Ibarra, Michael Jackson, Sean Kehoe, Franklin Kempner, Jerry Kenny, Scott Kidd, Dan Klatt, Kyle Krall, Ron Lake, Devon Lapier, Mike Lapier, Brent Lehr, Janine Lehr, Alex Llamas, Luis Lopez, Mauro Lopez, Martin Mahmoudi, Matt Manna, Elaine Marshall, Frank Marshall, Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Miller, Charles)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of R. Smith in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proof of Service) (Smith, Renee)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: GRANTING #19 Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LlC, designating Robyn E. Bladow as local counsel. (lt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/19/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23948039) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bladow, Robyn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23948039) #15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by July 3, 2019. In addition to the erros noted in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies (Docket No. 17), the application is not hand-signed (see Local Rule 5-4.3.4). The amended application must cure all defects. (lt) Modified on 6/21/2019 (lt).
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23948039) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): No state court/bar listed. (lt)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND REMAND MOTION #13 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For any defendant who has been properly served as of the date on which Plaintiffs' anticipated motion to remand is decided, the due date to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until 30 days after a ruling on Plaintiffs' anticipated motion to remand. (iv)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 ** STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS DATED 6/21/19 ** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23948039) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bladow, Robyn) Modified on 6/21/2019 (lt).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-05205 MWF(KSx). (rn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Remand Motion filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bladow, Robyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael E. Heygood on behalf of Plaintiffs Jose Acevedo, et al. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (lt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05211 (Bladow, Robyn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Renee D Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael E Heygood. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant Robert Bosch LLC Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/4/2019 Submitted with Attachment 3 Pg. 77 to Notice of #1 (car)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant General Motors LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/4/19 Submitted with attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant Courtesy Chevrolet Center served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Morales Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/4//19 Submitted with attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant Robert Bosch LLC as Agent for Robert Bosch Gmbh served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/4/2019 Submitted with attachment 3 to notice of removal Pg. 74 #1 (car) Modified on 6/17/2019 (car).
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Courtesy Chevrolet Center, General Motors LLC, Paradise Chevrolet, Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs. Filed in State Court on 5/10/2019 Submitted with attachment 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice (Other) #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 14, 2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow counsel for Defendant General Motors LLC. Adding Robyn E. Bladow as counsel of record for Defendant General Motors LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant General Motors LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 7.1 and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.4.1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19CHCV00392 Receipt No: 0973-23921700 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3)) (Attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Bladow, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mike Bulaon et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Lapier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrade
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Huizar
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ceja
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Hayes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Ibarra
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Ellis
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erasmo Garcia
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raed Ari
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bell
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Brannon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Breckenridge
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Marshall
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Doty
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Aleka
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Mahmoudi
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Braun
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Gill
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hayes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Belk
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Cobian
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Lopez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Belk
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Hughes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Delacruz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Krall
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kidd
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Ciapponi
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Dykier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bunker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Manna Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Lehr
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Capatosto
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Hernandez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Dean
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hale
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Gates
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Allen
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Einhaus
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Lake
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fee
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Huiza
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Marshall
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kehoe
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ellington
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brubaker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Kempner
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Aleka
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Fok
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hosford
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Davis
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Graham
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Gurtovoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Aukes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Curley
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Lopez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Acevedo
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Lehr
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dudley Baker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Hurtado
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Klatt
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Brubaker
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Bronstrup
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Kenny
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Coyner
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Holbrook
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blankenship
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Berry
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Garitano
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brenier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idovino Artifon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Lapier
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerando Barron
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meridith Holloway
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Hernandez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Anderson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Manna
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Duffy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Llamas
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Harms
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Barnhart
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dryer
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Duckworth
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Bulaon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtesy Chevrolet Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Robyn Eileen Bladow
Represented By: Renee D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?