Austin Myers v. Wells Fargo Securities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Austin Myers
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05245
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken. Counsel has filed corrected motion at DE 15. (hr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Austin Myers. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Supplement, #3 Proposed Order) (Holguin, Vida)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Austin Myers. Notice of Errata to Plf's Motion for Remand (Docket #12) (Holguin, Vida)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 **STRICKEN PER DKT. #16 ** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Austin Myers. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Supplement, #3 Proposed Order) (Holguin, Vida) Modified on 7/17/2019 (hr).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 9/16/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC.(Pelliconi, Bethany)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Pelliconi, Bethany)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mrgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 COPY OF STATE COURT PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Austin Myers, upon Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC served on 5/15/2019. Service of the Summons and First Amended Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Austin Myers. [Submitted as Exh. 1 to Removal](mrgo)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC filed by plaintiff Austin Myers. [Submitted as Exh. 1 to Removal] (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Pelliconi, Bethany)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, (Pelliconi, Bethany)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Bethanry A. Pelliconi re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Pelliconi, Bethany)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Brian Farrell re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Pelliconi, Bethany)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Pelliconi, Bethany)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV16408 Receipt No: 0973-23926920 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Bethany A Pelliconi added to party Wells Fargo Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Pelliconi, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin Myers v. Wells Fargo Securities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Bethany A Pelliconi
Represented By: Eric M Steinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Myers
Represented By: Vida M Holguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?