Leo Pappas v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Leo Pappas
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: MR LEO PAPPAS
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv05263
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 [PROOF OF SERVICE Filed as] AMENDED MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case against Defendant Leo Pappas. Re MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case #9 , filed by Leo Pappas Leo Pappas(Yates, Gregory) Modified on 8/2/2019 (iv).
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 2nd Amended Summons AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Leo Pappas amending MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case #9 , filed by Leo Pappas Leo Pappas(Yates, Gregory)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons #9 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Incorrect Event Selected. Correct event: Civil Events - Service Documents - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints - Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Summons with filing fee previously paid, filed by Plaintiff Leo Pappas.(Yates, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leo Pappas, (Yates, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Summons, 2 Complaint are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEETS-FILED as COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23930598 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff LEO PAPPAS. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint) (Attorney Gregory A Yates added to party LEO PAPPAS(pty:bkmov))(Yates, Gregory) Modified on 6/18/2019 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leo Pappas v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MR LEO PAPPAS
Represented By: Gregory A Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Pappas
Represented By: Gregory A Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?