United States of America v. Visanio Eugene Vann
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Defendant: VISANIO EUGENE VANN and Bagio Gancini
Garnishee: CDSS Adult Programs System Unit In Home Supportive Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv05265
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:3205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER of Garnishee to Writ of Garnishment filed by Garnishee CDSS Adult Programs System Unit In Home Supportive Services. (lom)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order, #5 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #7 , Writ of Garnishment #6 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BY U.S. MAIL served on 7/25/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order, #5 , Writ of Garnishment #6 SERVICE ON GARNISHEE BY CERTIFIED MAIL served on 7/05/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT GARNISHMENT TO DEBTOR (RE CDSS ADULT PROGRAMS SYSTEMS UNIT) ISSUED (lc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [RE CDSS ADULT PROGRAMSSYSTEMS UNIT] ISSUED. (lc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ( as to garnishee CDSS ADULT PROGRAMS SYSTEMS UNIT) AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT GARNISHMENT ( as to defendant Visanio Eugene Vann, also known as Bagio Gancini) #1 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (smo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Text Only Entry: This case has been assigned to United States District Judge S. James Otero. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:19-cv-05265-SJO. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (car) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Kirakosian, Louisa)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE CDSS ADULT PROGRAMS SYSTEMS UNIT [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b) No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Louisa O Kirakosian added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Louisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Visanio Eugene Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Louisa O Kirakosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Louisa O Kirakosian
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISANIO EUGENE VANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bagio Gancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: CDSS Adult Programs System Unit In Home Supportive Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?