Xiaolong Nmn Zhang v. District Director, Los Angeles Office, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Xiaolong Nmn Zhang
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr and Dist Dir USCIS LA Dist
Respondent: William Barr and District Director, Los Angeles Office, Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv05266
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #2 as to defendant District Director, Los Angeles Office, Department of Homeland Security. (lc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #2 as to defendant William Barr. (lc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #2 filed by Plaintiff Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Lum, Albert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #2 filed by Plaintiff Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Lum, Albert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #14 , Summons Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. official case number assigned 6/17/2019 is Missing" : 2:19-cv-05266-CAS-FFM. 2) Filer linked to the FIRST AMENDED PETITION..Please indicate this information on the Summons form as well.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #2 filed by Plaintiff Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Lum, Albert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #2 filed by Plaintiff Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Lum, Albert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Lum, Albert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit (non-trial) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Pdf is only a letter of decision MISSING Formal title page and its LR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court and case information and caption. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Petitioner Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. Exhibit as to Amended Complaint/Petition #2 . (Lum, Albert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #2 as to Respondent William Barr. (car)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #2 as to Respondent District Director, Los Angeles Office, Department of Homeland Security. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Petitioner Xiaolong Nmn Zhang, (Lum, Albert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #2 filed by Plaintiff Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Lum, Albert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #2 filed by Plaintiff Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Lum, Albert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 First AMENDED PETITION against Defendant Respondent All Defendants amending Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Petitioner Xiaolong Nmn Zhang(Lum, Albert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION Receipt No: 0973-23933561 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Xiaolong Nmn Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Notice Interested Parties) (Attorney Albert C Lum added to party Xiaolong Nmn Zhang(pty:pla))(Lum, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiaolong Nmn Zhang v. District Director, Los Angeles Office, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dist Dir USCIS LA Dist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaolong Nmn Zhang
Represented By: Albert C Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: District Director, Los Angeles Office, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?