Nancy Strauss v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Strauss
Defendant: Jackie Green, County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control"), Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone"), Rebecca Leal, Does 4-20, Sal Chacon and County of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2019cv05277
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: granting #12 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of the order to file an Opposition to Dismiss the Complaint. (sbou)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of address Changing plaintiff's address to Nancy Strauss, PO Box 7315, Alhambra CA 91802. Filed by Plaintiff Nancy Strauss. (sbou)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Nancy Strauss. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (sbou)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned addressed to Nancy Strauss P.O. Box 2784 west Covina, CA 91793 re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, #10 (sbou)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order Vacating July 30, 2019 Hearing; Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (ECF No. #8 ) noticed for July 30, 2019, at 10 a.m., is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance is necessary. Plaintiff shall serve and file an opposition to the motion to dismiss (not to exceed 25 pages) no later than July 15, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendants Sal Chacon, County of Los Angeles, Jackie Green, Rebecca Leal. (Carpenter, Scott)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Sal Chacon, County of Los Angeles, Jackie Green, Rebecca Leal. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott J. Carpenter, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Carpenter, Scott)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. All future pleadings shall be addressed to Ilene Bernal, Clerk to Magistrate Judge MacKinnon, United States Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. (See document for further details.) (et)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Defendant Doe 3 amending Complaint - (Referred). Plaintiff having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 3 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Rebecca Leal, filed by plaintiff Nancy Strauss. Amendment to Complaint Filed in State Court on 5/22/19 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Defendant Doe 2 amending Complaint - (Referred). Plaintiff having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 2 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Sal Chicone, filed by plaintiff Nancy Strauss. Amendment to Complaint Filed in State Court on 5/22/19 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Defendant Doe 1 amending Complaint - (Referred). Plaintiff having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Jackie Green, filed by plaintiff Nancy Strauss. Amendment to Complaint Filed in State Court on 5/22/19 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 6/18/2019 (car).
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Los Angeles County, Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control, Does 1-20, filed by plaintiff Nancy Strauss. Filed in State Court on 6/17/19 Submitted with Exhibit A attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone"), County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control"), Jackie Green, Rebecca Leal, re Notice (Other), #4 served on 06/17/19. (Williams, Jill)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by DEFENDANTS Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone"), County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control"), Jackie Green, Rebecca Leal. (Williams, Jill)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANTS Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone"), County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control"), Jackie Green, Rebecca Leal, (Williams, Jill)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone"), County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control"), Jackie Green, Rebecca Leal. (Williams, Jill)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 18STCV08363 Receipt No: 0973-23932991 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANTS Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone"), Jackie Green, County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control"), Rebecca Leal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jill Williams added to party Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone")(pty:dft), Attorney Jill Williams added to party County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control")(pty:dft), Attorney Jill Williams added to party Jackie Green(pty:dft), Attorney Jill Williams added to party Rebecca Leal(pty:dft))(Williams, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nancy Strauss v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Green
Represented By: Jill Williams
Represented By: Scott Joseph Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles (errouneously sued herein as "Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Department of Animal Care and Control")
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sal Chacon (erroneously sued as "Sal Chicone")
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Leal
Represented By: Jill Williams
Represented By: Scott Joseph Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sal Chacon
Represented By: Jill Williams
Represented By: Scott Joseph Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Jill Williams
Represented By: Scott Joseph Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?