Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Forever 21, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: ANB Apparel, Inc., Palo Apparel, Inc., Does 1 through 10, San Joy, Inc. and Forever 21, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05284
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement of Certain Claims filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Palo Apparel, Inc., identifying Palo Apparel, Inc.. (Fox, Gerard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Palo Apparel, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerard P. Fox In Support Of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to G. Fox In Support, #3 Exhibit 2 to G. Fox In Support, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions) (Fox, Gerard)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN CLAIMS #18 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The claims in this action as to Infringing Product allocated Style No. JFT673 and RN133305 and SKU No. 00248202013 and pictured in Plaintiff's operative Complaint at numbered paragraph 21(b) are hereby dismissed without prejudice. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Dismiss Certain Claims as to Defendant San Joy, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for October 7, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULE. (lom)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant San Joy, Inc., identifying San Joy, Inc. and Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Myung, Soohyun)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant San Joy, Inc..(Attorney Soohyun Calvin Myung added to party San Joy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Myung, Soohyun)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Palo Apparel, Inc. answer now due 7/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Palo Apparel, Inc..(Attorney Gerard P Fox added to party Palo Apparel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fox, Gerard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Palo Apparel, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Corporate Agents, Inc., Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant ANB Apparel, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ki Bong Ko, Authorized Agent for Service c/o Jay Song, Manager Authorized to Receive in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant San Joy, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Seung Woo Chung, Owner Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Forever 21, Inc. answer now due 7/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc..(Burroughs, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Forever 21, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service c/o Alberto Damonte in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants ANB Apparel, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Palo Apparel, Inc., San Joy, Inc. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23934928 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Forever 21, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANB Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Apparel, Inc.
Represented By: Sebastian Elan Kaplan
Represented By: Brigitte Josephine Khoury
Represented By: Gerard P Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joy, Inc.
Represented By: Soohyun Calvin Myung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever 21, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?