Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Forever 21, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Forever 21, Inc. and Love Vintage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05287
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Love Vintage, Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Soo J Kim, Authorized Agent c/o Octavio Reyes, Employee Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON REQUEST TO REOPEN CASE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #13 REQUEST: FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: The case is hereby reopened in its entirety. Defendants Forever 21, Inc. and Love Vintage, Inc. will file their Answers on August 16, 2019. (bm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burroughs, Scott) Modified on 8/6/2019 (bm).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Notice of Settlement #11 : IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Forever 21, Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent c/o Carlos Paz in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Forever 21, Inc., Love Vintage, Inc. (lh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23935142 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Forever 21, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever 21, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Vintage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?