Donna Livni v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Livni
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05289
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 9/16/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2)(lh)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Donna Livni. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Jury Demand #4 served on 6/17/2019. (Oaks, Ashley)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.. (Oaks, Ashley)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, identifying DONNA LIVNI,MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (Oaks, Ashley)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV16545 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 06/17/2019, receipt number 26I7I23B), filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-MBUSA's Conformed Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Ashley Elise Oaks added to party Mercedes-Benz USA LLC(pty:dft))(Oaks, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donna Livni v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: Ashley Elise Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Represented By: Ashley Elise Oaks
Represented By: Benson Yeager Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Livni
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?