Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company v. H and S Electric Inc.
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company
Defendant: H and S Electric Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05347
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from SEPTEMBER 9, 2019 to NOVEMBER 4, 2019 filed by plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Scheduling Conference)(Hutchinson, Peter)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J David Sackman counsel for Plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company. Adding J. David Sackman as counsel of record for Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company. (Attorney J David Sackman added to party Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company(pty:pla))(Sackman, J)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 01:30 P.M. This matter is set for a scheduling conference in Courtroom 9C, before the Honorable Dean D. Pregerson, located at350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The conference will be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). Lead trial counsel shall attend the scheduling conference. See order for details. (shb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David S McLeod counsel for Defendant H and S Electric Inc.. Adding David S. McLeod as counsel of record for H & S Electric Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant H & S Electric Inc.. (McLeod, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Sheryl Grock counsel for Defendant H and S Electric Inc.. Adding Jennifer S. Grock as counsel of record for H & S Electric Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant H & S Electric Inc.. (Grock, Jennifer)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #12 , Notice of Appearance #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jennifer Sheryl Grock on behalf of Defendant H and S Electric Inc. (Attorney Jennifer Sheryl Grock added to party H and S Electric Inc.(pty:dft))(Grock, Jennifer)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David S McLeod on behalf of Defendant H and S Electric Inc. (McLeod, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant H and S Electric Inc., identifying H & S Electric Inc.; International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers; Southern California IBEW-NECA Trust Funds; Southern California District Council of Laborers. (McLeod, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant H and S Electric Inc..(Attorney David S McLeod added to party H and S Electric Inc.(pty:dft))(McLeod, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company, upon Defendant H and S Electric Inc. served on 7/21/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennette Doe, Secretary, person apparently in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hutchinson, Peter)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant H and S Electric Inc. (esa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company, a Delaware limited liability company, c/o Peter A. Hutchinson, Esq., REICH, ADELL & CVITAN, a PLC, 3550 Wilshire Blvd., (Hutchinson, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71), #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company, a Delaware limited liability company, c/o Peter A. Hutchinson, Esq., REICH, ADELL & CVITAN, a PLC, 3550 Wilshire Blvd.. (Hutchinson, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company, a Delaware limited liability company, c/o Peter A. Hutchinson, Esq., REICH, ADELL & CVITAN, a PLC, 3550 Wilshire Blvd.. (Hutchinson, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23945382 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company, a Delaware limited liability company, c/o Peter A. Hutchinson, Esq., REICH, ADELL & CVITAN, a PLC, 3550 Wilshire Blvd.. (Attorney Peter A Hutchinson added to party Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company, a Delaware limited liability company, c/o Peter A. Hutchinson, Esq., REICH, ADELL & CVITAN, a PLC, 3550 Wilshire Blvd.(pty:pla))(Hutchinson, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company v. H and S Electric Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H and S Electric Inc.
Represented By: David S McLeod
Represented By: Jennifer Sheryl Grock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Trust Funds For Southern California Administrative Company
Represented By: Marsha Michiko Hamasaki
Represented By: Alexander Bernard Cvitan
Represented By: Peter A Hutchinson
Represented By: J David Sackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?