A.G. v. Intel Corporation Health Plan et al
Plaintiff: A. G.
Defendant: Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company and Intel Corporation Health Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05364
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy B. Pridgen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24276720) filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Sullivan, Donald)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan.(Sullivan, Donald)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Pro Hac Vice Application #18 , for the following reasons: Other: Application not hand-signed. See LRS-4.3.4; Failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.5 Re: Mandatory Chambers (bm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION to Correct APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy B. Pridgen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24255978) #18 , Hand Written Signature of Local Counsel, Jessica C. Gregg filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan. (Sullivan, Donald)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Defendant Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company.(Nalty, Sean)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy B. Pridgen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24255978) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 8/16/19. APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy B. Pridgen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24255978) filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jessica C Gregg added to party Intel Corporation Health Plan(pty:dft)) (Gregg, Jessica) Modified on 8/16/2019 (bm).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: denying #15 Non-Resident Attorney Nancy B Pridgen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan. Pursuant to L.R. 83-2.1.3.4; Local Counsel does not maintain office District. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the pro hac vice application fee, if paid, be refunded. Terming Attorney Nancy B Pridgen. (bm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy B. Pridgen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24228606) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy B. Pridgen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24228606) filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Donald)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Intel Corporation Health Plan answer now due 8/16/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan.(Attorney Donald P Sullivan added to party Intel Corporation Health Plan(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Donald)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company answer now due 8/16/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by defendant Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Sean P Nalty added to party Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Nalty, Sean)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. G., upon Defendant Intel Corporation Health Plan served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Keith Elliott - Senior Paralegal in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Green, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. G., upon Defendant Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent, By Serving Gabriela Sanchez, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Green, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company, Intel Corporation Health Plan amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff A. G.(Green, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 17-1. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company, Intel Corporation Health Plan. (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff A. G., (Green, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff A. G.. (Green, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff A. G.. (Green, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23949848 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff A. G.. (Attorney Elizabeth K Green added to party A. G.(pty:pla))(Green, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.G. v. Intel Corporation Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health And Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation Health Plan
Represented By: Nancy B Pridgen
Represented By: Jessica C Gregg
Represented By: Donald P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. G.
Represented By: Elizabeth K Green
Represented By: Lisa S Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?