NZG Specialties, Inc. v. M L C Berries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc. and NZG Specialties, Inc.
Defendant: Miguel Campos and M L C Berries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05380
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendants M L C Berries, Inc., Miguel Campos. (jp)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Miguel Campos, M L C Berries, Inc. filed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Cartee, Anthony)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc., upon Defendant Miguel Campos served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Avril Reyes in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cartee, Anthony)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant NZG Specialties, Inc., upon Defendant M L C Berries, Inc. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Avril Reyes, person in charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cartee, Anthony)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Miguel Campos. (lh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant M L C Berries, Inc. (lh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc.. (Cartee, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc.. (Cartee, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc. (Cartee, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc., (Cartee, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc.. (Cartee, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23952884 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc.. (Attorney Anthony B Cartee added to party NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc.(pty:pla))(Cartee, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NZG Specialties, Inc. v. M L C Berries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NZG Specialties, Inc. d/b/a Gourmet Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony B Cartee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NZG Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony B Cartee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M L C Berries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?