United States of America v. Christopher Philip Ahn
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Christopher Philip Ahn
Case Number: 2:2019cv05397
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 3184
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 110 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Case is called. Counsel make their appearances. Defendant Christopher Ahn is present. Pretrial Services Officer Brenda Mercado is also present and addresses the Court. The Court advised the parties of a potential conflict of interest it might have, and the parties both waived any conflict, with the concurrence of counsel. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (sbou)
July 26, 2019 Filing 109 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Status Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bem) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The extradition hearing in this case is scheduled for January 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Status Conference scheduled for July 18, 2019, at 11:00 a.m., is HEREBY VACATED. (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 17, 2019 Filing 96 STIPULATION for Order to Schedule Extradition and Briefing and Vacate Status Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lulejian, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 108 SEALED SHORT FORM DEED OF TRUST in the amount of $635,000 (Attachments: #1 Appraisal, #2 Title, #3 Bank Statement) (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 107 SEALED SHORT FORM DEED OF TRUST in the amount of $180,000 (Attachments: #1 Appraisal, #2 Title, #3 Bank Statement) (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 106 SEALED SHORT FORM DEED OF TRUST in the amount of $270,000 (Attachments: #1 Appraisal, #2 Bank Statement, #3 Title Docs, #4 Bank Doc) (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 105 SEALED DOCUMENT - SEALED DOCUMENT (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 104 REDACTED Affidavit of Surety Christopher Philip Ahn Approved by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 103 SEALED DOCUMENT - SEALED DOCUMENT, (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 102 REDACTED Affidavit of Surety filed by Christopher Philip Ahn Approved by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 101 SEALED DOCUMENT - SEALED DOCUMENT (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 100 REDACTED Affidavit of Surety filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn Approved by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 99 SEALED DOCUMENT - SEALED DOCUMENT (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 98 REDACTED MODIFIED BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed by by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn in the amount of $ 1,265,000. (ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 95 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn, re Sealed Document #94 served on July 16, 2019. (Lee, Jumin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 94 SEALED DOCUMENT STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF BAIL CONDITION re Stipulation for Order #89 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #92 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn.(Lee, Jumin)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER FOR MODIFICATION OF BAIL CONDITION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The Parties' Stipulation for Modification of Bond is GRANTED. The bond amount for the affidavit of surety guaranteed by full deeding of the Property associated with the $670,000 bond is modified from $670,000 to $635,000. #87 (sbou)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting #90 APPLICATION to Seal Document. Re: Sealed Declaration #91 . (sbou)
July 15, 2019 Filing 91 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF BAIL CONDITION under seal #90 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Lee, Jumin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 90 APPLICATION to file document STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION OF BAIL CONDITION under seal filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Lee, Jumin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 89 STIPULATION for Order Modification of Bail Condition (Redacted) filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jumin)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENIED by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Does not comply with Local Criminal Rule 46-2.1. re Stipulation for Order #87 . (sbou)
July 12, 2019 Filing 87 STIPULATION for Order for Modification of Bail Condition filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rim, Naeun)
July 11, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/28/2019 re Transcript #85 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kleeger, Sheri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 11, 2019 Filing 85 PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/28/2019 9am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SHERI S. KLEEGER, phone number 213-894-6604. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2019. (Kleeger, Sheri)
July 10, 2019 Filing 84 CHRISTOPHER PHILIP AHN'S REDACTED APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #59 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting #82 EX PARTE APPLICATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unredacted version of Christopher Philip Ahn's Application for Reconsideration of Order Denying Application for Reconsideration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities shall be filed under seal. (sbou)
July 10, 2019 Filing 82 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file under seal filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 10, 2019 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter. Court will contact David Shortell at david.shortell@turner.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (ha)
July 9, 2019 Filing 81 SEALED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN re #80 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 80 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 79 SEALED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN re #78 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 78 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 77 SEALED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN re #76 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 76 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou) .
July 9, 2019 Filing 75 SEALED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN re #74 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 74 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF THIRD-PARTY CUSTODIAN filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 73 MINUTES OF REVIEW /RECONSIDERATION OF BAIL /DETENTION ORDER -BOND HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Court ORDERS bail as to the above-named defendant $1,300,000.00 (See Attached Copy of CR-01 Bond Form for Conditions of Release.) Deft shall be released to Pretrial Services only. Third-Party Custodians are placed under oath &ordered to fulfill certain duties as detailed at the under-seal proceedings. Bond, surety forms, & third- party custodian forms are to be filed Under Seal with redacted versions placed on the docket. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 71 SEALED PASSPORT RECEIPT as to Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (shb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 70 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (CR-4) filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4) #69 (ja)
July 9, 2019 Filing 69 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 75,000 Filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn (ja)
July 9, 2019 Filing 68 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (CR-4) filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4) #67 (ja)
July 9, 2019 Filing 67 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 65,000 Filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn (ja)
July 9, 2019 Filing 66 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (CR-4) filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4) #65 (ja)
July 9, 2019 Filing 65 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 40,000 Filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn (ja)
July 9, 2019 Filing 64 DECLARATION Re: PASSPORT filed as to Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn, declaring that I have been issued a passport or other travel document(s), but they are not currently in my possession. I will surrender any passport or other travel document(s) issued to me, to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency by the deadline imposed. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (ja)
July 9, 2019 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff United States of America DCN number: R19A1256 for Court Reporter. (Lulejian, John)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER FOR STIPULATION FOR CONTINUED BAIL HEARING by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. IT IS SO ORDERED that that the parties' Stipulation for Continued Bail Hearing is granted. Relator Christopher Philip Ahn's continued bail hearing is set for July 9, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. re #61 (sbou)
July 3, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Continue Bail Hearing to July 9, 2019 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #58 filed by Plaintiff Christopher Philip Ahn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rim, Naeun)
July 2, 2019 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Christopher Philip Ahn, re SEALED APPLICATION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Application for Reconsideration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #58 #59 served on July 2, 2019. (Rim, Naeun)
July 2, 2019 Filing 59 SEALED APPLICATION for Reconsideration of Order Denying Application for Reconsideration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #58 filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn. Application set for hearing on 6/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Rim, Naeun)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTES Order Conditionally Granting Relator's Applications for Reconsideration of Denial of Application for Reconsideration and for Leave to File Under Seal (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The Court conditionally grants both the Application for Reconsideration of Denial of Application for Reconsideration and the request for leave to file the names of the proposed third-party custodians under seal, the latter for the reasons stated on the record at the June 28 hearing. (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 1, 2019 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Christopher Philip Ahn for Court Reporter. Court will contact Naeun Rim at nrim@birdmarella.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Rim, Naeun)
June 28, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTES OF Application for Bail Reconsideration held before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Case called. Counsel make their appearances. Amy Kerbeck, Pretrial Services officer is present. The Court hears argument. During under-seal proceedings, the Court places proposed Third-Party Custodians under oath and questions them. The Court takes the Relator's Application for Reconsideration and Application to Seal under submission. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (sbou)
June 28, 2019 Filing 55 REQUEST FOR EXTRADITION FILED BY THE UNITED STATES; REDACTED EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lulejian, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 54 OPPOSITION to Relator's Application for Reconsideration of Order Denying Application for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Lulejian, John)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SEALING by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting #43 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case. (sbou) Modified on 6/27/2019 (sbou).
June 26, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY filed by Defendant Christopher Philip Ahn to Miscellaneous Document #50 Government's Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Under Seal (Lee, Jumin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Request for Extradition Filed by the United States; Redacted Exhibits re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #49 (Lulejian, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 50 OPPOSITION TO RELATOR'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Lulejian, John)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: No later than 6/25/19, the government must either lodge a proposed redacted version of the extradition request and accompanying documents or withdraw its sealing request. (See document for details). (ib)
June 21, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Notice of Reference #47 The correct District Judge is John F. Walter. Attached to this notice is the corrected Notice of Reference. (Attachments: #1 cv 105) (esa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The within action has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for decision pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3184 and General Order 05-07. (esa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney United States of America. (esa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE to consolidate filed by plaintiff United States of America. (esa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION for order allowing filing its request for extradition under seal without copies or service of exhibits (original formal extradition documents); DECLARATION of John J. Lulejian filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (esa)
June 20, 2019 CRIMINAL MAGISTRATE CASE No. 2:19-mj-1523 consolidated with Civil Case No. 2:19-cv-05397 JFW (JPR). All documents filed in the criminal magistrate case are consolidated with this civil action. Please refer to the criminal magistrate case docket sheet to review docket entries made prior to the start of this civil action. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Christopher Philip Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Philip Ahn
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Ekwan E Rhow
Represented By: Jumin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John J Lulejian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?