United States of America v. Lisa Danielle Mendez
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Defendant: LISA DANIELLE MENDEZ
Garnishee: Grassroots Voter Outreach, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05429
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:3205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER of Garnishee to Writ of Garnishment by Grassroots Voter Outreach, Inc.. (lc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order #5 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #7 , Writ of Garnishment #6 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BY U.S. MAIL served on 7/12/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order #5 , Writ of Garnishment #6 SERVICE ON GARNISHEES BY CERTIFIED MAIL served on 7/05/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT GARNISHMENT (RE TELEFUND, INC. ANDGRASSROOTS VOTER OUTREACH ) TO DEBTOR. (lc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (TELEFUND, INC. AND GRASSROOTS VOTER OUTREACH) ISSUED. (lc)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUING POST JUDGMENT GARNISHMENT (TELEFUND, INC. AND GRASSROOTS VOTEROUTREACH) #1 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (smo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Text Only Entry: This case has been assigned to United States District Judge S. James Otero. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:19-cv-05429-SJO. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Kirakosian, Louisa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEES TELEFUND, INC. AND GRASSROOTS VOTER OUTREACH [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Louisa O Kirakosian added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Louisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lisa Danielle Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Louisa O Kirakosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Indira J Cameron-Banks
Represented By: Louisa O Kirakosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA DANIELLE MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Grassroots Voter Outreach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?