Steven Gianelli et al v. Starbucks Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Steven Gianelli and Miles Jones
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks, Roberto Carlos Sierra, Starbucks Corporation, Does 1 to 10 and Starbucks Corporation a Washington corporation doing business as Starbucks
Case Number: 2:2019cv05438
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Arbitration filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Tiffany)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Status Report #18 . In that Report, the parties indicate that they have agreed to submit this matter to binding arbitration. In light of the parties' agreement, they shall meet and confer and file a stipulation and proposed order by no later than August 16, 2019 as to whether this action shall be stayed pending arbitration or dismissed without prejudice. The August 2, 2019 Scheduling Conference is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.. (Woods, Tiffany)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiffs Steven Gianelli, Miles Jones (Richie, Darren)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Tiffany Woods re: (1) Filing of Notice of Removal and Notice to Clerk in Los Angeles County Superior Court and Service of Notice of Removal on Plaintiffs; and (2) Filing of Proof of Service filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration C)(Woods, Tiffany)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Darren Michael Richie counsel for Plaintiffs Steven Gianelli, Miles Jones. Delaney Miller is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Steven Giannelli and Miles Jones. (Richie, Darren)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Second NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darren Michael Richie on behalf of Plaintiffs Steven Gianelli, Miles Jones (Richie, Darren)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darren Michael Richie on behalf of Plaintiffs Steven Gianelli, Miles Jones (Richie, Darren)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, re Declaration #7 re: Declaration of Sarah Rogers served on June 21, 2019. (Woods, Tiffany)
June 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Filed in state court 5/17/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
June 21, 2019 COPY OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL IN STATE COURT filed by plaintiffs Steven Gianelli, Miles Jones as to Roberto Carlos Sierra. (submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
June 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OFPROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Steven Gianelli, Miles Jones, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 4/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed in state court 4/17/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa)
June 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Roberto Carlos Sierra, Starbucks Corporation, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Steven Gianelli, Miles Jones. (Filed in state court 3/27/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Sarah Rogers re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks. (De Leon, Lara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks. (De Leon, Lara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks (De Leon, Lara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks, identifying Plaintiff Steven Giannelli; Plaintiff Miles Jones; Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (De Leon, Lara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Lara C. De Leon re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks. (De Leon, Lara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks. (De Leon, Lara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California-Van Nuys, case number 19VECV00424 Receipt No: 0973-23963655 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Request for Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Lara Cardin De Leon added to party Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks(pty:dft))(De Leon, Lara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Gianelli et al v. Starbucks Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gianelli
Represented By: Darren Michael Richie
Represented By: Alister S L Wong
Represented By: Antonio Castillo, III
Represented By: Delaney L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Jones
Represented By: Darren Michael Richie
Represented By: Alister S L Wong
Represented By: Antonio Castillo, III
Represented By: Delaney L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks
Represented By: Lara Cardin De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Carlos Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Lara Cardin De Leon
Represented By: Tiffany Shanae Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation a Washington corporation doing business as Starbucks
Represented By: Lara Cardin De Leon
Represented By: Tiffany Shanae Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?