Curtis Randolph v. Bank of America National Association
Plaintiff: Curtis Randolph
Defendant: Banc One Capital Markets, Inc., DOES 1-10, Countrywide Financial Corp., Recontrust, NA, Americas Wholesale Lender, Countrywide LP, Bank of New York Mellon, Bear Stearns and Co., Inc., Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, CWABS Asset Backed Certificates Series 2004-2, Bank of America National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration MERS, Countrywide GP, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, The Mortgage Law Firm, CWABS, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, The Wolf Firm and Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv05482
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Curtis Randolph, re Exhibit (non-trial) #3 , Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , Request for Judicial Notice #4 served on 7/23/2019, 7/25/2019, and 7/30/2019. (mrgo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Curtis Randolph, re Exhibit (non-trial) #3 , Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , Request for Judicial Notice #4 served on (unnamed defendant/party Newres LLC by serving CSC Lawyers Inc, agent for Service by serving Becky Degeorge) on 7/22/2019 by personal service. (mrgo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:19cv07201 CAS (PLAx), filed by plaintiff Curtis Randolph. (mrgo)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Curtis Randolph. (et)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 as to defendants Americas Wholesale Lender, Banc One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank of America National Association, Bank of New York Mellon, Bear Stearns and Co., Inc., CWABS Asset Backed Certificates Series 2004-2, CWABS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corp., Countrywide GP, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, Countrywide LP, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration MERS, Recontrust, NA, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, The Mortgage Law Firm, The Wolf Firm. (mrgo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Wolf Firm , a Law Corporation filed by Defendant The Wolf Firm. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Abe Gordon Salen added to party The Wolf Firm(pty:dft)) (Salen, Abe)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed order is missing. Per Local Rule 5-4.4, "the proposed order or other proposed document shall be in PDF format and included, as an attachment, to the main electronically filed document (e.g., stipulations, applications, motions). Or electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging." In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #14 . Defendants CWABS Asset Backed Certificates Series 2004-2; CWABS, Inc.; and Mortgage Electronic Registration MERS's answers due 8/26/2019. (mrgo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Mortgage Law Firm, identifying None. (Lewin, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendant The Mortgage Law Firm. (Lewin, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant The Mortgage Law Firm. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attorney James F Lewin added to party The Mortgage Law Firm(pty:dft)) (Lewin, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing answer now due 8/26/2019; Bank of New York Mellon answer now due 8/26/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 filed by DEFENDANTS Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing; Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ryan K Woodson added to party Bank of New York Mellon(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan K Woodson added to party Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing(pty:dft))(Woodson, Ryan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Per L.R. 52-4.1 Separate Order. A separate proposed order shall be submitted with any stipulation, application, motion, or request of the parties requiring an order of the court. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP (erroneously sued as "Bank of America; National Associat, CWABS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, fka Red Oak Merger Corporation, successor by merger to Countrywide Financial Corporation (erroneously sued as Countrywide Financial Corp.), Countrywide Home Loans Inc., formerly dba Americas Wholesale Lender (erroneously sued as Americas Wholesale Lender and Countrywide Home Loans), Countrywide Securities Corporation, ReconTrust Company, N.A. (erroneously sued as ReconTrust, N.A.), (Campbell, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP (erroneously sued as "Bank of America; National Associat, CWABS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corporation, fka Red Oak Merger Corporation, successor by merger to Countrywide Financial Corporation (erroneously sued as Countrywide Financial Corp.), Countrywide Home Loans Inc., formerly dba Americas Wholesale Lender (erroneously sued as Americas Wholesale Lender and Countrywide Home Loans), Countrywide Securities Corporation, ReconTrust Company, N.A. (erroneously sued as ReconTrust, N.A.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Campbell, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP (erroneously sued as "Bank of America; National Association, successor by merger to BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP"; Countrywide GP, Inc. and Countrywide LP), Countrywide Home Loans Inc., formerly dba Americas Wholesale Lender (erroneously sued as Americas Wholesale Lender and Countrywide Home Loans), Countrywide Financial Corporation, fka Red Oak Merger Corporation, successor by merger to Countrywide Financial Corporation (erroneously sued as Countrywide Financial Corp.), ReconTrust Company, N.A. (erroneously sued as ReconTrust, N.A.). Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party CWABS, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Countrywide Securities Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Bank of America, N.A., successor by July 1, 2011 de jure merger with BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP (erroneously sued as "Bank of America; National Association, successor by merger to BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP fka Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP"; Countrywide GP, Inc. and Countrywide LP)(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Countrywide Home Loans Inc., formerly dba Americas Wholesale Lender (erroneously sued as Americas Wholesale Lender and Countrywide Home Loans)(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Countrywide Financial Corporation, fka Red Oak Merger Corporation, successor by merger to Countrywide Financial Corporation (erroneously sued as Countrywide Financial Corp.)(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party ReconTrust Company, N.A. (erroneously sued as ReconTrust, N.A.) (pty:dft)) (Campbell, John)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Curtis Randolph. (jtil)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Curtis Randolph. (jtil)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBITS filed by Plaintiff Curtis Randolph. (jtil)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Curtis Randolph. (jtil)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Curtis Randolph against Defendants Americas Wholesale Lender, Banc One Capital Markets, Inc., Bank of America National Association, Bank of New York Mellon, Bear Stearns and Co., Inc., CWABS Asset Backed Certificates Series 2004-2, CWABS, Inc., Countrywide Financial Corp., Countrywide GP, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, Countrywide LP, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration MERS, Recontrust, NA, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, The Mortgage Law Firm, The Wolf Firm. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) #2 Summons Request) (jtil). Modified on 6/27/2019 (jtil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Randolph v. Bank of America National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc One Capital Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americas Wholesale Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Brett Brandon Goodman
Represented By: Ryan K Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Stearns and Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Brett Brandon Goodman
Represented By: Ryan K Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWABS Asset Backed Certificates Series 2004-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide GP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mortgage Law Firm
Represented By: James F Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWABS, Inc.
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Securities Corporation
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wolf Firm
Represented By: Abe Gordon Salen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?