Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan et al v. Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC
Plaintiff: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Health Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan and Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan
Defendant: TRIO ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company and Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05494
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT TRIO ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES GROUP, LLC'S LAST DAY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY THIRTY DAYS #10 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLCs last day to respond to the Complaint shall be continued from August 21, 2019, to September 20, 2019. (iv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC, identifying Lynne Brown and Edward Strang. (Rogson, Yuval)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC answer now due 9/20/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Yuval Mordechai Rogson added to party Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Rogson, Yuval)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Health Plan, upon Defendant Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynn Brown, Boss, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Halford, Kathryn)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC. (ghap)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN, (Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23973873 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Elizabeth Rosenfeld added to party BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN(pty:pla))(Rosenfeld, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan et al v. Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIO ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES GROUP, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trio Entertainment Services Group, LLC
Represented By: Yuval Mordechai Rogson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Health Plan
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?