United Talent Agency, LLC v. Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United Talent Agency, LLC
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Barbara Hall and Deirdre Mangan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05585
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Ethan E. Litwin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. and for Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., designating Anthony R Segall as local counsel. (lom)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney W. Stephen Cannon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. and for Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., designating Anthony R Segall as local counsel. (lom)
August 19, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ethan E. Litwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimants Barbara Hall, Deirdre Mangan, Deirdre Mangan, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24289269) filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Barbara Hall, Deirdre Mangan, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Segall, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney W. Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimants Barbara Hall, Deirdre Mangan, Deirdre Mangan, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24289190) filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Barbara Hall, Deirdre Mangan, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Barbara Hall(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Deirdre Mangan(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Deirdre Mangan(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:cc)) (Segall, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against United Talent Agency, LLC filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Deirdre Mangan, Barbara Hall.(Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Deirdre Mangan(pty:cc), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Barbara Hall(pty:cc))(Leyton, Stacey)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #20 , Defendants Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. shall have until 9/13/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (gk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/13/19 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitts, P)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC, upon Defendant Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Payne, Stephen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC, upon Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Payne, Stephen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen P Berzon counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen P Berzon added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen P Berzon added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Berzon, Stephen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey M Leyton counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Leyton, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rebecca C Lee counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Rebecca C Lee added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca C Lee added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney P Casey Pitts counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Adding P. Casey Pitts as counsel of record for Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney P Casey Pitts added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney P Casey Pitts added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pitts, P)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-05465 AB(AFMx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05585 AB(AFMx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05701-RGK-JEM (Marenberg, Steven)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (et)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05465-RSWL-AFM (Marenberg, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC (Marenberg, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC, (Marenberg, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC. (Marenberg, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC. (Marenberg, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23991965 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff United Talent Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint) (Attorney Steven A Marenberg added to party United Talent Agency, LLC(pty:pla))(Marenberg, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Talent Agency, LLC v. Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Talent Agency, LLC
Represented By: Victor H Jih
Represented By: Jean P Nogues
Represented By: Jeremy M Mittman
Represented By: Stephen M Payne
Represented By: Steven A Marenberg
Represented By: Adam Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: P Casey Pitts
Represented By: Stephen P Berzon
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: P Casey Pitts
Represented By: Stephen P Berzon
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Barbara Hall
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Deirdre Mangan
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?