Curtis Clifford Ingram v. C. Rachal et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Clifford Ingram
Defendant: Correctional Officer M. Sauceda and Correctional Officer C. Rachal
Case Number: 2:2019cv05605
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 . (dts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Notice of Dismissal Form) (dts).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. (dts)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (dts)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Curtis Clifford Ingram. (et)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants C. Rachal(official capacity), C. Rachal(individual), M. Sauceda(individual), M. Sauceda(official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato., filed by Plaintiff Curtis Clifford Ingram. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Clifford Ingram v. C. Rachal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Clifford Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer M. Sauceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer C. Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?