Daniel Grant v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Grant
Defendant: DOES 1 through100, Jacqueline Cruz, Starbucks Corporation and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 2:2019cv05606
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on July 16, 2019. (Darrow, Tanja)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Order Setting Rule 26f Scheduling Conference by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 8:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (smo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (smo)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-08927 SJO(KSx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05606 SJO(KSx). Signed by Judge S. James Otero (rn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Starbucks Corporation, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 served on June 28, 2019. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
June 27, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 27, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Jacqueline Cruz, Does 1 through 100, Starbucks Corporation., filed by Plaintiff Daniel Grant. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/22/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying (1) Michael Grant, Plaintiff Daniel Grant's brother and Plaintiff in a related case pending in this Court; (2) City of Hawthorne, Defendant in a related case pending in this Court and Defendant Jacqueline Cruz.. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-08927-SJO-KS (Darrow, Tanja)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation identifying Starbucks certifies that it is a publicly traded corporation; it has no parent companies, subsidiaries or affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public in the United States; and no publicly traded corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. as Corporate Parent. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV17812 Receipt No: 0973-23996478 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow in Support of Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice to Federal Court of Removal, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint to Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow, #3 Exhibit B- Answer to Complaint and Notice of Related Cases to Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow, #4 Exhibit C-Summons and Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Notice of Case Assignment, Order to Show Cause and Notice of Case Mamagement Conference to Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow) (Attorney Tanja L Darrow added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Darrow, Tanja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Grant v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Grant
Represented By: Leslie Keith Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Represented By: Cristen Rebekah Hintze
Represented By: Nasim Asadi Khansari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?