Creative Artists Agency, LLC v. Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Creative Artists Agency, LLC
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Barbara Hall, Meredith Stiehm, Patricia Carr, David Simon, Ashley Gable and Deric A. Hughes
Case Number: 2:2019cv05701
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kendall, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv)
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ethan E Litwin counsel for Counter Claimants Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, Meredith Stiehm. Adding Ethan E. Litwin as counsel of record for Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, and Meredith Stiehm for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Counterclaimants Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, and Meredith Stiehm. (Attorney Ethan E Litwin added to party Patricia Carr(pty:cc), Attorney Ethan E Litwin added to party Ashley Gable(pty:cc), Attorney Ethan E Litwin added to party Barbara Hall(pty:cc), Attorney Ethan E Litwin added to party Deric A. Hughes(pty:cc), Attorney Ethan E Litwin added to party David Simon(pty:cc), Attorney Ethan E Litwin added to party Meredith Stiehm(pty:cc))(Litwin, Ethan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney W Stephen Cannon counsel for Counter Claimants Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, Meredith Stiehm. Adding W. Stephen Cannon as counsel of record for Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric S. Hughes, David Simon, and Meredith Stiehm for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Counterclaimants Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, and Meredith Stiehm. (Attorney W Stephen Cannon added to party Patricia Carr(pty:cc), Attorney W Stephen Cannon added to party Ashley Gable(pty:cc), Attorney W Stephen Cannon added to party Barbara Hall(pty:cc), Attorney W Stephen Cannon added to party Deric A. Hughes(pty:cc), Attorney W Stephen Cannon added to party David Simon(pty:cc), Attorney W Stephen Cannon added to party Meredith Stiehm(pty:cc))(Cannon, W)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Ethan E. Litwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., designating Anthony R. Segall as local counsel #23 . (gk)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney W. Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., designating Anthony R. Segall as local counsel #22 . (gk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ethan E. Litwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimants Patricia Carr, Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24289345) filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Segall, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney W. Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimants Patricia Carr, Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24289301) filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Patricia Carr, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Patricia Carr(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Patricia Carr(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Ashley Gable(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Barbara Hall(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Deric A. Hughes(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party David Simon(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Meredith Stiehm(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:cc)) (Segall, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Creative Artists Agency, LLC filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Patricia Carr, Deric A. Hughes, David Simon, Ashley Gable, Barbara Hall, Meredith Stiehm.(Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Patricia Carr(pty:cc), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Ashley Gable(pty:cc), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Barbara Hall(pty:cc), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Deric A. Hughes(pty:cc), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party David Simon(pty:cc), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Meredith Stiehm(pty:cc))(Leyton, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #19 , Defendants Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. shall have until 9/13/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (gk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/13/19 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitts, P)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC, upon Defendant Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ann Burdick, General Counsel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kendall, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen P Berzon counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen P Berzon added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen P Berzon added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Berzon, Stephen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey M Leyton counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Leyton, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rebecca C Lee counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Rebecca C Lee added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca C Lee added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney P Casey Pitts counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Adding P. Casey Pitts as counsel of record for Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney P Casey Pitts added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney P Casey Pitts added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pitts, P)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC, upon Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tony Segal, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kendall, Richard)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-05465 AB(AFMx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05701 RGK(JEMx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (jtil)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05465-RSWL-AFM; 2:19-cv-05585-JAK-AFM (Kendall, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC (Kendall, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC, (Kendall, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC. (Kendall, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC. (Kendall, Richard)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24008839 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Creative Artists Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Richard B Kendall added to party Creative Artists Agency, LLC(pty:pla))(Kendall, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Artists Agency, LLC v. Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Stephen P Berzon
Represented By: P Casey Pitts
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Stephen P Berzon
Represented By: P Casey Pitts
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Artists Agency, LLC
Represented By: Richard B Kendall
Represented By: Nicholas Frederic Daum
Represented By: Patrick J Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Barbara Hall
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Meredith Stiehm
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Patricia Carr
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: David Simon
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ashley Gable
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Deric A. Hughes
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?