Vic International Marine Services US, LLC v. Damyan B. Zhelev et al
Plaintiff: Vic International Marine Services US, LLC
Defendant: Robert C. McKay, I4 Survey Italy, Srl, I4 Survery Global, Srl, Damyan B. Zhelev, 14 Survey UK Limited, 14 Survey Iberian Sociedad Limitada, Does 1 through 10 and Robert C. McKay, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv05716
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE [STIPULATION ON SERVICE AND FOR DEFENDANTS DAMYAN B. ZHELEV AND ROBERT C. MCKAY, II TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] Dkt. #24 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the following deficiency(ies) has been found with your electronically filed document:Local Rule 8-3 Response to INITIAL COMPLAINT. Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re STIPULATION ON SERVICE AND FOR DEFENDANTS DAMYAN B. ZHELEV AND ROBERT C. MCKAY, II TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT" with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by 8/26/2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robert C. McKay, II answer now due 9/12/2019; Damyan B. Zhelev answer now due 9/12/2019, filed by defendants Robert C. McKay, II; Damyan B. Zhelev.(Attorney Graham Matthew Cridland added to party Robert C. McKay, II(pty:dft), Attorney Graham Matthew Cridland added to party Damyan B. Zhelev(pty:dft))(Cridland, Graham)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Plaintiff's Report on the Filing of an Action regarding a Copyright)(Abbasciano, Stefano)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 as to Defendant 14 Survey UK Limited. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 as to Defendant Robert C. McKay, II. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 as to Defendant Damyan B. Zhelev. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 as to Defendant I4 Survey Italy, Srl. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 as to Defendant I4 Survery Global, Srl. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 as to Defendant 14 Survey Iberian Sociedad Limitada. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Parrish, Lisa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Parrish, Lisa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Parrish, Lisa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Parrish, Lisa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Parrish, Lisa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #4 filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Parrish, Lisa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-A to the Amended Complaint)(Valla, Antonio)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC, identifying Vic Inspection Services Holding Limited, et al.. (Attorney Stefano Abbasciano added to party Vic International Marine Services US, LLC(pty:pla))(Abbasciano, Stefano)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Parrish, Lisa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24012073 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Vic International Marine Services US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-A to the Complaint) (Attorney Antonio Valla added to party Vic International Marine Services US, LLC(pty:pla))(Valla, Antonio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vic International Marine Services US, LLC v. Damyan B. Zhelev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I4 Survey Italy, Srl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I4 Survery Global, Srl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damyan B. Zhelev
Represented By: Graham Matthew Cridland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14 Survey UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14 Survey Iberian Sociedad Limitada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. McKay, II
Represented By: Graham Matthew Cridland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vic International Marine Services US, LLC
Represented By: Stefano Abbasciano
Represented By: Antonio Valla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?