Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P. v. S V Seanachie
Plaintiff: Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.
Defendant: S V Seanachie
Claimant: Mike J. Farrell and Federal Interior Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2019cv05742
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0953
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order of sale re: Interlocutory Sale of Vessel and Authorizing Plaintiff to Credit Bid filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. Motion set for hearing on 9/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of Service) (Gruft, Alexander)
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Alexander T Gruft counsel for Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. Changing Address to 520 Broadway, Suite 200, Santa Monica, CA 90401. Filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Gruft, Alexander)
August 12, 2019 Filing 29 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to S V Seanachie. (iv)
August 9, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant S V Seanachie filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. Request set for hearing on 8/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander T Gruft) (Gruft, Alexander)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P., upon Defendant Vessel Owner and Mortgagee Mike J. Farrell served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Federal Interior Credit Union served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Claimants in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gruft, Alexander)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Order on Motion for Service by Publication #14 , returned executed upon S V Seanachie on 7/24/19. Remarks: Sent to LA Daily for Publication 7/24/19 (see attachment notice of arrest of vessel). (lc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) RE Sub-Custodian, #18 , returned executed upon S V Seanachie on 7/13/19. Remarks: Served sub-custodian, Kelly King (General Manager) (see attachment notice of vessel arrest). (lc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Warrant In Rem Issued, #21 , returned executed upon S V Seanachie on 7/13/19. Remarks: Posted on vessel. (lc)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REQUIRE PUBLIC NOTICE OF ARREST by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Service by Publication. The Motion of Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P. to require public notice of arrest of Defendant S/V SEANACHIE is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall promptly give public notice of the action and arrest in the Los Angeles Daily Journal. (sbou)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN AND AUTHORIZING MOVEMENT OF DEFENDANT VESSEL by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #5 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian. Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P., the Plaintiff herein, owns and operates the Villa Del Mar Marina, located at 13999 Marquesas Way, Marina del Rey, California. Plaintiff has agreed to assume the responsibility for safekeeping of the said Defendant Vessel, and to act as her Substitute Custodian until further Order of this Court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (sbou)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF VESSEL as to S/V SEANACHIE, a 1974 Uniflite sailboat of approximately 42 feet in length documented with the United States Coast Guard under Official Number 1269086, its riggings, tackle, apparel, furniture, engines, bunkers, and all other necessaries thereunto appertaining and belonging (Defendant Vessel) issued. SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. (sbou)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR ARREST OF DEFENDANT VESSEL by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #15 Ex EX PARTE APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel. IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Clerk shall issue a warrant for the arrest of the vessel S/V SEANACHIE, a 1974 Uniflite sailboat of approximately 42 feet in length documented with the United States Coast Guard under Official Number 1269086, its riggings, tackle, apparel, furniture, engines, bunkers, and all other necessaries thereunto appertaining and belonging ("Defendant Vessel"). The United States Marshal of this District is authorized to and shall serve the Warrant of Arrest on the Defendant Vessel, take it into custody, and keep it in custody until further order of the Court or upon the Marshal's acceptance and approval of a stipulation, bond, or other security signed by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel and expressly authorizing such release, if all costs and charges of the court and its officers shall have first been paid. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (sbou) Modified on 7/3/2019 (sbou).
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 Text Entry Order: The Court vacates its Orders filed July 2, 2019 Docket Numbers #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 and #18 and refers the all the Ex Parte Applications to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN AND FOR AUTHORIZATION FOR MOVEMENT OF DEFENDANT VESSEL #5 by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P. satisfies the local rule and GRANTS the motion to appoint Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P. as substitute custodian authorized to move the Defendant Vessel. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF VESSEL issued. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR ARREST OF DEFENDANT VESSEL #4 by Judge John F. Walter. IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The clerk issue a warrant for the arrest of the vessel S/V SEANACHIE, United States (Official No. 1269086), its engines, machinery, appurtenances, dinghies, etc. The United States Marshal of this District is authorized to and shall serve the Warrant of Arrest on the Defendant Vessel, take it into custody, and keep it in custody until further order of the Court or upon express authorization from Plaintiff's attorney. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Gruft, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REQUIRE PUBLIC NOTICE OF ARREST #6 by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff shall promptly give public notice of the action and arrest in the Los Angeles Daily Journal. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) (1) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUPPLEMENT APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT #4 ; AND (2) TENTATIVE RULINGREGARDING APPLICATIONS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (klg)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05742 JFW(JCx). (rn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant S/V Seanachie. (jtil)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P., (Gruft, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Service by Publication filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gruft, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P. filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Gruft, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Arrest of Vessel filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Warrant) (Gruft, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Gruft, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Gruft, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24016745 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.. (Attorney Alexander T Gruft added to party Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.(pty:pla))(Gruft, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P. v. S V Seanachie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S V Seanachie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Villa Del Mar Properties, Ltd., L.P.
Represented By: Alexander T Gruft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mike J. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Federal Interior Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?