Lonnie Edward Fantry Jr. v. Joe Lizarraga
Petitioner: Lonnie Edward Fantry, Jr
Respondent: Joe Lizarraga
Case Number: 2:2019cv05751
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, ORDERING Letter to Clerk submitted by Petitioner Lonnie Edward Fantry, Jr received on 8/1/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Fed.R.Civ.P.5 No proof of service attached to document. (sp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss #6 . The Court is in receipt of Respondent's "Motion to Dismiss, etc.", filed 7/19/19. Petitioner shall file opposition to the motion within 30 days of the date of this order. At that time, the Court will take the motion under submission without oral argument, unless the Court otherwise orders. Failure to file timely opposition to the motion may result in the denial and dismissal of the Petition. Respondent need not file an Answer to the Petition until further order order of this Court. (sp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #6 (Attachments: #1 LD1, #2 LD2, #3 LD3)(Byrne, Kenneth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent Joe Lizarraga. (Attorney Kenneth C Byrne added to party Joe Lizarraga(pty:res)) (Byrne, Kenneth)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Lonnie Edward Fantry, Jr. (sp)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. It is Ordered that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon Respondent's attorneys, a copy of every future pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. (sp)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. It is Hereby Ordered that Respondent file an Answer to the Petition within 23 days of the date of this Order. All lodged documents must be numbered sequentially. Each lodged document must be stapled or otherwise securely fastened, and must bear the lodgment and case number on the first page of the document. It is Further Ordered that, if Petitioner desires to file a Reply to the Answer, Petitioner shall do so within 15 days of the date that the Answer is filed. It is Further Ordered that Respondent shall give timely notice of any court proceeding to any person who is a "crime victim" within the meaning of 18 U.S.C. section 3771. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Notice) (sp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #1 CV111) (esa).
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick,(Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Lonnie Edward Fantry, Jr. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lonnie Edward Fantry Jr. v. Joe Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lonnie Edward Fantry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Lizarraga
Represented By: Kenneth C Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?