Sina Kianpour v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sina Kianpour
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo and Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05812
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the basis of: Order Dismissing Action filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment) (Campbell, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Sina Kianpour, re PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER #19 served on 8/26/19. (bm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by plaintiff Sina Kianpour. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bm)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case: For all these reasons, the complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) is therefore GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed and the action dismissed without leave to amend. (see document for further details) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (bm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 to Reply Brief filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Campbell, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Campbell, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Sina Kianpour, re Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss The Complaint, Memorandum Of Points and Authorities #14 , Notice of Lodging #15 , CD served on 8/7/19. (bm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour (bm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS ("MTD") THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES re: MOTION TO DISMISS #10 filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour. (bm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Campbell, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Campbell, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Campbell, John)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL Executed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour, upon Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019; Wells Fargo and Company served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon not indicated in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge S. James Otero, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-01757 SJO(GJSx) (rn)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiffs REQUEST for Courts Permission to use CM/ECF in this Case, filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour. (lh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour. (lh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. (lh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing Fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sina Kianpour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sina Kianpour v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sina Kianpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?