Efrain Salinas v. People of the State of California, et al
Petitioner: Efrain Salinas, Jr. and Efrain Salinas, Jr
Respondent: Warden and People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2019cv05814
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent is granted to and including September 29, 2019, to file a Motion to Dismiss or Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Courts July 31, 2019, Order remains otherwise in effect. #13 (sbou)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition filed by Respondent People of the State of California, Warden. Application set for hearing on 9/29/2019 at 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Lindsay Sara Boyd added to party People of the State of California(pty:res)) (Boyd, Lindsay)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lindsay Sara Boyd on behalf of Respondent Warden (Attorney Lindsay Sara Boyd added to party Warden(pty:res))(Boyd, Lindsay)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: that Respondent People of the State of California file Answer to the Petition not later than 9/3/2019; Warden file Answer to the Petition not later than 9/3/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (sbou)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING REQUIREMENTS FOR PREPARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. All future documents submitted in this case should be addressed to: "Clerk, U.S. District Court, Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, CA 90012-1565." (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas Corpus) - optional html form, #7 . Document number 7 due to clerical error. The docket clerk issued Notice of Reference to a U.S. Magistrate Judge with the wrong Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The correct Magistrate Judge is Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38) (ghap)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38) (ghap)
July 2, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Efrain Salinas Jr. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/8/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to the U. S. District Court for the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/1/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/8/2019.]
July 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Efrain Salinas Jr. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/8/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/8/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Efrain Salinas, Jr. #2 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/1/2019. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/8/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Efrain Salinas, Jr. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/8/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of the State of California, Warden by Efrain Salinas, Jr.(Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Efrain Salinas v. People of the State of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Lindsay Sara Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Represented By: Lindsay Sara Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Efrain Salinas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Efrain Salinas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?