Bonnie Burr v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Bonnie Burr
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv05844
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 8/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bonnie Burr, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by Serving Becky DeGeorge Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Glenn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (et)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bonnie Burr. (Kantor, Glenn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bonnie Burr, (Kantor, Glenn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bonnie Burr. (Kantor, Glenn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24044190 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bonnie Burr. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Bonnie Burr(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonnie Burr v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Burr
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Andrew Michael Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?