Jenna Cedicci et al v. Scatterlight Studios, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jenna Cedicci and Magnus Persson
Defendant: Scatterlight Studios, LLC, Domo, Inc., Doe and Christopher Billig
Case Number: 2:2019cv05847
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Harris, D)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SCATTERLIGHT STUDIOS, LLC AND CHRISTOPHER BILLIG TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT #14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Defendants Scatterlight Studios, LLC and Christopher Billig shall have through and including August 27, 2019 to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint filed by Attorneys for Christopher Billig, Scatterlight Studios, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Lei Lei Wang Ekvall added to party Christopher Billig(pty:dft), Attorney Lei Lei Wang Ekvall added to party Scatterlight Studios, LLC(pty:dft))(Ekvall, Lei Lei)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT #12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendant Domo, Inc.'s answer due 8/27/2019. (lc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 08/27/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Domo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Gregory M Saylin added to party Domo, Inc.(pty:dft))(Saylin, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson, upon Defendant Christopher Billig served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Manny Stucki, household occupant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Harris, D)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson, upon Defendant Scatterlight Studios, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scatterlight Studios, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Harris, D)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson, upon Defendant Domo, Inc. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Harris, D)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Christopher Billig, Domo, Inc., Scatterlight Studios, LLC. (esa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson, (Harris, D)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson. (Harris, D)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 * REQUEST TO ISSUE SUMMONS * filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiffs Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson. (Harris, D) Modified on 7/8/2019 (esa).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24044271 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Jenna Cedicci, Magnus Persson. (Attorney D Alan Harris added to party Jenna Cedicci(pty:pla), Attorney D Alan Harris added to party Magnus Persson(pty:pla))(Harris, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenna Cedicci et al v. Scatterlight Studios, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scatterlight Studios, LLC
Represented By: Lei Lei Wang Ekvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domo, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M Saylin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Billig
Represented By: Lei Lei Wang Ekvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Cedicci
Represented By: David Covington Garrett
Represented By: Min Ji Gal
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnus Persson
Represented By: David Covington Garrett
Represented By: Min Ji Gal
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?