International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 848 v. MV Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 848
Defendant: MV Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05849
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference #10 , previously scheduled for 8/26/2019 at 11:00 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference is continued to 9/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference is set for 8/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant MV Transportation, Inc..(Ehinger, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MV Transportation, Inc., identifying MV Transportation, Inc.. (Ehinger, James)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MV Transportation, Inc. answer now due 8/14/2019, filed by Defendant MV Transportation, Inc..(Attorney James Oakleaf Ehinger added to party MV Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ehinger, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Certification as to Interested Parties, and No. 3 Summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant MV Transportation, Inc. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24045807 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 848. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Summons) (Attorney Julie Gutman Dickinson added to party International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 848(pty:pla))(Gutman Dickinson, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 848 v. MV Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 848
Represented By: Dexter Flood Rappleye
Represented By: Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Represented By: Julie Gutman Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: James Oakleaf Ehinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?