Velia L. Foster v. Alex M. Azar, II et al
Plaintiff: Velia L. Foster
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv05861
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
2 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
3 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. (hr)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Upon further review of this case, it does not fall under General Order 05-07 and therefore is not suitable for a Report and Recommendation. Therefore, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Steven V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05861 SVW(KSx). (rn)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, this case falls under General Order 05-07 and should have been assigned to District Judge S. James Otero, as a previous Report and Recommendation case was heard by him. The case has been reassigned to District Judge S. James Otero.. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05861 SJO(KES). (rn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Velia L. Foster. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Velia L. Foster. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Velia L. Foster against Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons Request) (jtil) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jtil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velia L. Foster v. Alex M. Azar, II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velia L. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?