Linda Bryant v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Linda Bryant
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv05866
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019. (ake)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Linda Bryant; Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA); Connecticut General Corporation; Cigna Holdings, Inc.; Cigna Holding Company; Cigna Corporation. (Ingram, Grant)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Blohm, Nicole)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 8/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Linda Bryant, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz of CT Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (et)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Linda Bryant. (Bather, Phillip)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Linda Bryant. (Bather, Phillip)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Linda Bryant, (Bather, Phillip)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24047565 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Linda Bryant. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Linda Bryant(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda Bryant v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Represented By: Grant E Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bryant
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?