Produce International, LLC v. Fresh Is Best, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Produce International, LLC
Defendant: Reina Melchor, Ever Melchor, Antonio Melchor and Fresh Is Best, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05935
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. (Botta, Bartholomew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC, upon Defendant Reina Melchor served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ever Melchor, Co-Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Botta, Bartholomew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC, upon Defendant Antonio Melchor served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ever Melchor, Co-Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Botta, Bartholomew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC, upon Defendant Ever Melchor served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Botta, Bartholomew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC, upon Defendant Fresh Is Best, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ever Melchor, Chief Executive Officer in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Botta, Bartholomew)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney June T Monroe counsel for Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. Changing address to 2603 Main Street, Suite 1250, Irvine, CA 92614. Filed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. (Monroe, June)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Bartholomew M Botta counsel for Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. Changing address to 2603 Main Street, Suite 1250, Irvine, CA 92614. Filed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. (Botta, Bartholomew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Fresh Is Best, Inc., Antonio Melchor, Ever Melchor, Reina Melchor. (car)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC, (Botta, Bartholomew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. (Botta, Bartholomew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. (Botta, Bartholomew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24059876 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Produce International, LLC. (Attorney Bartholomew M Botta added to party Produce International, LLC(pty:pla))(Botta, Bartholomew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce International, LLC v. Fresh Is Best, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reina Melchor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ever Melchor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Melchor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Is Best, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Produce International, LLC
Represented By: Bartholomew M Botta
Represented By: June T Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?