Barron E. Hopkins v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Barron E. Hopkins
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv05957
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-5957 SP on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Annabelle J Yang added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Yang, Annabelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Barron E. Hopkins, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 7/30/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHERI PYM [SOCIAL SECURITY]: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM SIMILAR ORDERS BY OTHER JUDGES: Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint and a copy of this order on defendant in the manner required by Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order. Defendants counsel shall file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the summons and complaint. Defendant shall electronically serve on plaintiff a complete copy of the administrative record within 90 days of the service of the complaint (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (sbou)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Barron E. Hopkins, (Rosales, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Barron E. Hopkins. (Rosales, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Barron E. Hopkins. (Rosales, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Barron E. Hopkins. (Rosales, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Barron E. Hopkins. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Barron E. Hopkins(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron E. Hopkins v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Annabelle J Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barron E. Hopkins
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?