Unicolors, Inc. v. See Plus Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, Adornar, Macys, Inc., Sarah Jane Snyder, See Plus Inc., Dani II, Inc., Love on Haight Inc., United Fashions of Texas, LLC, Dani II, Inc. a New York corporation, individually doing business as KAS New York, See Plus Inc. a California corporation, individually doing business as Camma, Macys, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually doing business as Bloomingdales.com, United Fashions of Texas, LLC a Texas Corporation, individually doing business as Melrose Family Fashions, Sarah Jane Snyder an individual doing business as Gratefully Threaded and Adornar a California Corporation, individually doing business as Wholesale Fash
Case Number: 2:2019cv05989
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE DEFENDANT DANI II, INC. (DKT. #26 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: On August 28, 2019, default was entered against Defendant, Dani II, Inc. Dkt. 26. The Court sets the hearing on the motion for default judgment for December 16, 2019 at 8:30 am, which shall be served on Defendants and filed with the Court no later than November 4, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Dani II, Inc., a New York Corporation, individually and dba "KAS New York". (jp)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement of Certain Claims filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Dani II, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendant Macy's Inc's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #22 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the relief requested through the Stipulation is GRANTED IN PART as follows: The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #13 , which is presently set for 09/30/2019, is continued to 12/16/2019 at 8:30 AM. The Scheduling Conference (Dkt. 19), which is presently set for 09/30/2019, is continued to 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM. If a settlement is not reached by 12/6/2019, counsel shall file a Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report. If no notice of settlement has been filed, any opposition to the Motion shall be filed on or before 11/18/2019. If an opposition to the Motion is filed, any reply thereto shall be filed on or before 12/2/2019. (jp)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant Macy's Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss from 9/30/2019 to 12/9/2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #13 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 20 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Trevor W. Barrett, #2 Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT MACY'S, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DKT. #13 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from September 9, 2019 to September 30, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall submit courtesy copies of their respective motion papers to this Court no later than August 13, 2019.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Adornar, Love on Haight Inc., Sarah Jane Snyder. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05989 JAK(GJSx). (rn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Macys, Inc., (Christman, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #13 filed by Defendant Macys, Inc.. (Christman, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Macys, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael C Christman added to party Macys, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Christman, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Macys, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporate Creations Network, Inc., Registered Agent c/o Joelle Agena in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Service Documents - select - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints - select -Service of Summons and Complaint Executed 21 days. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Dani II, Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kirat Anand, Chief Executive Offiver in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to See Plus Inc., United Fashions of Texas, LLC. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Adornar, Dani II, Inc., Love on Haight Inc., Macys, Inc., See Plus Inc., Sarah Jane Snyder, United Fashions of Texas, LLC. (lh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24067576 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. See Plus Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adornar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Jane Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See Plus Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dani II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love on Haight Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fashions of Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dani II, Inc. a New York corporation, individually doing business as KAS New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See Plus Inc. a California corporation, individually doing business as Camma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually doing business as Bloomingdales.com
Represented By: Michael C Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fashions of Texas, LLC a Texas Corporation, individually doing business as Melrose Family Fashions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Jane Snyder an individual doing business as Gratefully Threaded
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adornar a California Corporation, individually doing business as Wholesale Fash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?