James Ezra Strong Cockrell v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: James Ezra Strong Cockrell
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv05991
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-5991 KS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff James Ezra Strong Cockrell. (Drake, Erika)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Ezra Strong Cockrell, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Proof)(Drake, Erika)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (hr)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff James Ezra Strong Cockrell, (Drake, Erika)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff James Ezra Strong Cockrell. (Drake, Erika)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Ezra Strong Cockrell. (Drake, Erika)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff James Ezra Strong Cockrell. (Drake, Erika)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff James Ezra Strong Cockrell. (Attorney Erika Bailey Drake added to party James Ezra Strong Cockrell(pty:pla))(Drake, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Ezra Strong Cockrell v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jean M Turk
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ezra Strong Cockrell
Represented By: Erika Bailey Drake
Represented By: Roger David Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?