Jennifer A Gates v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Gates
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv05992
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Valerie Baker Fairbank
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Gates. (Krank, Laura)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Gates, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (hr)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #5 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Gates. (Krank, Laura)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Gates, (Krank, Laura)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Gates. (Krank, Laura)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Gates. (Krank, Laura)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Gates. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Jennifer A. Gates(pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennifer A Gates v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Gates
Represented By: Laura E Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?