Catherine Ann Gallagher v. Swarovski North America Limited
Plaintiff: Catherine Ann Gallagher
Defendant: SWAROVSKI NORTH AMERICA LIMITED, a Rhode Island corporation, Swarovski North America Limited and DOES 1 to 10, inclusive (11-50 TERMED)
Case Number: 2:2019cv06052
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 5/15/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on August 26, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 6, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 10, 2020. (iv)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 or 7-10 days, filed by Defendant Swarovski North America Limited.. (Howard, Rachel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Catherine Ann Gallagher, identifying Miracle Mile Law Group, LLP.; Justin Hanassab, counsel for Plaintiff; Steven Azizi, Counsel for Plaintiff.. (Hanassab, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES #14 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from August 26, 2019 to September 23, 2019 filed by Defendant Swarovski North America Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Howard, #2 Proposed Order)(Howard, Rachel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Nancy Pritikin Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Swarovski North America Limited. (Pritikin, Nancy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Justin Hanassab Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Catherine Ann Gallagher. (Hanassab, Justin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Catherine Ann Gallagher.. (Hanassab, Justin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Hanassab counsel for Plaintiff Catherine Ann Gallagher. Adding Justin Hanassab as counsel of record for Catherine Ann Gallagher for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Catherine Ann Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hanassab, Justin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Swarovski North America Limited.(Howard, Rachel)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 8/26/2019 at 01:15 PM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 8/12/2019. (jp)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (jp)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of John Ericson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant SWAROVSKI NORTH AMERICA LIMITED, a Rhode Island corporation. (Howard, Rachel)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Catherine Ann Gallagher in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/11/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Howard, Rachel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SWAROVSKI NORTH AMERICA LIMITED, a Rhode Island corporation. (Howard, Rachel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV20384 Receipt No: 0973-24083093 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant SWAROVSKI NORTH AMERICA LIMITED, a Rhode Island corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B to Notice of Removal, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Rachel P Howard added to party SWAROVSKI NORTH AMERICA LIMITED, a Rhode Island corporation(pty:dft))(Howard, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catherine Ann Gallagher v. Swarovski North America Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Ann Gallagher
Represented By: Justin Hanassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWAROVSKI NORTH AMERICA LIMITED, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Rachel P Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swarovski North America Limited
Represented By: Rachel P Howard
Represented By: Adam Ryan Rosenthal
Represented By: Nancy E Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, inclusive (11-50 TERMED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?