Armando Alba v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Armando Alba
Defendant: Does 1 - 100 inclusive, Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. and DOES 1 to 10, inclusive (11- 100 terminated)
Case Number: 2:2019cv06072
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM. Trial set for 7/28/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on August 26, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: March 2, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: March 6, 2020. (iv)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc... (Kim, Sean)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Betsy Johnson (Lead Trial Counsel) Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Kim, Sean)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Alan Harris RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Plaintiff Armando Alba. (Garrett, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Armando Alba, identifying Armando Alba & Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Garrett, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Sean M. Kim Regarding Notice of Removal to Plaintiff and Superior Court filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kim, Sean)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 8/26/2019 at 01:15 PM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 8/12/2019. (jp)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (jp)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
July 15, 2019 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Armando Alba in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/11/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. as to Request for Judicial Notice #6 . (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Sean Kim re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Bradley Carl re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. identifying Clean Harbors, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Kim, Sean)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 19STCV20233 Receipt No: 0973-24086337 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Status Conference Order), #3 Exhibit C (Answer - Non-Conformed)) (Attorney Sean Min Kim added to party Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kim, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armando Alba v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Min Kim
Represented By: Betsy Johnson
Represented By: Hanna B Raanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, inclusive (11- 100 terminated)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Alba
Represented By: D Alan Harris
Represented By: David Covington Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?