Whitaker v. 752 South Main Property, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, 752 South Main Property, LLC and Wild Living Foods, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06086
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error: This document was inadvertently filed in the wrong case. Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order #16 . (sbou)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES (In Chambers): Notice to Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Before this case can proceed further, plaintiff must submit either the $400 filing fee or a Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fee (Form CV-60P). This must be done by September 9, 2019. (See document for details.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (sbou)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wild Living Foods, LLC answer now due 9/25/2019, filed by defendant Wild Living Foods, LLC.(Attorney Richard A Torres added to party Wild Living Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Torres, Richard)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to 752 South Main Property, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (shb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant 752 South Main Property, LLC filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Wild Living Foods, LLC served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: LIZBETH SANCHEZ in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant 752 South Main Property, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY(Becky De George-Agent For Service) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #8 The wrong image was inadvertently attached to the above docket entry, the correct image has now been attached. (rn)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06086 RSWL(JEMx). (rn) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/22/2019) (rn).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants 752 South Main Property, LLC, Wild Living Foods, LLC. (et)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24088499 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. 752 South Main Property, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 752 South Main Property, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Living Foods, LLC
Represented By: Richard A Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?